GREATFIELD PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1089770
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £5.66k £5.80k £5.58k £9.15k £3.92k
Total expenditure £4.23k £6.86k £5.36k £9.45k £6.27k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A