U-CAN ASK ANGELS
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We run a Saturday Club for children with communication difficulties and their families.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 27 October 2019
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Hillingdon
Governance
- 07 May 2002: Standard registration
- 06 November 2020: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2015 | 27/10/2016 | 27/10/2017 | 27/10/2018 | 27/10/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.99k | £2.78k | £12.39k | £5.15k | £3.35k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.07k | £12.37k | £3.80k | £5.14k | £5.88k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £500 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 27 October 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 27 October 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 27 October 2019 | 26 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 27 October 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 27 October 2018 | 04 May 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 27 October 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 27 October 2017 | 03 March 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 27 October 2017 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON THE 2ND OCTOBER 2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 16TH APRIL 2002.
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ("THE OBJECTS") ARE THE RELIEF OF THE NEEDS OF CHILDREN WITH DISABILITIES AND THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS THROUGH THE PROVISION OF SERVICES, SUPPORT AND ASSISTANCE INCLUDING, WITHOUT LIMITATION, THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN WITH SPEECH IMPAIRMENTS AND COMMUNICATION DIFFICULTIES, THE PROVISION OF TRAINING, INFORMATION AND ADVICE TO FAMILIES, CARERS AND PROFESSIONALS, THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION OPPORTUNITIES FOR FAMILIES AND CARERS AND THE PROVISION OF ASSESSMENT AND TREATMENT SERVICES, SIBLING SUPPORT, RESPITE, COUNSELLING, ADVOCACY AND MEDIATION."
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window