Trustees THE BEETHOVEN PIANO SOCIETY OF EUROPE

Charity number: 1092069
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Julian Jacobson Chair 01 December 2015
None on record
Jan Loeffler Trustee 11 August 2021
None on record
Karl Josef Lutchmayer Trustee 16 March 2020
None on record
Melvyn Cooper Trustee 14 August 2018
THE PIANO TRIO SOCIETY
Received: On time
THE LISZT SOCIETY LIMITED
Overdue by 102 days
Martin Elmer Cotton Trustee 04 October 2017
None on record
Angela Mary Brownridge Trustee 04 October 2017
None on record
Clive Nunn Trustee 01 January 2017
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF EARLEY ST PETER
Received: On time
Bobby Haur Bin Chen Trustee 16 March 2014
None on record
Nadia Lasserson Trustee 01 April 2000
EPTA - EUROPEAN PIANO TEACHERS' ASSOCIATION (UK) LIMITED
Received: On time
EPTA-EUROPEAN PIANO TEACHERS ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
Malcolm Bernard Bela Miller Trustee 30 October 1994
None on record