Accounts and annual returns WELTON SCHOOL PARENT TEACHERS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1089760
Charity reporting is overdue by 144 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 144 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 144 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 02 December 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 02 December 2022 305 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 01 December 2022 669 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 18 October 2022 991 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required