ASHTON AMENITY AREA

Charity number: 1090338
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2020 09 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2019 04 September 2020 4 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2018 16 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2017 26 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2016 28 February 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2016 Not Required