ALNWICK AND DISTRICT CHORAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 1090411
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2020 27 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2019 18 August 2020 79 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2018 16 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2017 08 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2016 20 March 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016 Not Required