ALNWICK AND DISTRICT CHORAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 1090411
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020
Total gross income £12.05k £10.66k £12.87k £11.96k £11.75k
Total expenditure £14.10k £12.48k £13.35k £11.20k £9.57k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A £400 N/A