Accounts and annual returns THE HYTHE SINGERS

Charity number: 1090818
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2022 30 May 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 08 December 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 08 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 08 November 2020 131 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 14 February 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required