The Olympia Charitable Trust

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Each year the charity provides support to charities and organisations within the Borough of Hammersmith and Fulham and in the Royal Borough of Kensington and Chelsea. The primary focus of the trust is to benefit young people with an emphasis on education, health and personal development (which includes the arts and sports).
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Hammersmith And Fulham
- Kensington And Chelsea
Governance
- 20 March 2002: Standard registration
- THE EARLS COURT & OLYMPIA CHARITABLE TRUST (Previous name)
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Oluwatosin Adewumi | Trustee | 08 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Vanessa Elizabeth Eden | Trustee | 01 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paolo Renzo Sedazzari | Trustee | 01 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Louise Page-Jennings | Trustee | 14 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Jeremiah O'Sullivan | Trustee | 11 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Aarien Uday Om Areti | Trustee | 11 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Adam Peter Lang | Trustee | 11 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Thorpe | Trustee | 15 May 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.00k | £0 | £0 | £7.52k | £35.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.62k | £4.69k | £1.18k | £6.28k | £36.03k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 24 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 24 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 20 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 04 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 20 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 26TH OCTOBER 2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 14 SEP 2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 15 MAY 2017 as amended on 01 May 2024 as amended on 19 Sept 2024
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY IS THE PROMOTION OF CHARITABLE PURPOSES, INCLUDING 1) THE RELIEF OF PERSONS IN NEED, HARDSHIP, SICKNESS OR DISTRESS 2) THE FURTHERANCE OF EDUCATION 3) THE PROVISION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE OF RECREATIONAL FACILITIES 4) THE PROMOTION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF URBAN OR RURAL REGENERATION IN AREAS OF SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC DEPRIVATION 5) THE RELIEF OF UNEMPLOYMENT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AND PROVISION OF TRAINING, ESPECIALLY AMONG UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE; AND 6) THE PROTECTION OR CONSERVATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF THE ENVIRONMENT; IN ANY AREA BUT IN PARTICULAR IN THE LONDON BOROUGHS OF HAMMERSMITH & FULHAM AND KENSINGTON & CHELSEA TOGETHER THE OBJECTS
Area of benefit
LONDON BOROUGHS OF HAMMERSMITH & FULHAM AND KENSINGTON & CHELSEA
Contact information
- Address:
-
Olympia Events
Hammersmith Road
Kensington
London
W14 8UX
- Phone:
- 02075982484
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window