Trustees HOPE AND HOMES FOR CHILDREN
Charity number: 1089490

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RICHARD CECIL GREENHALGH | Chair | 01 June 2017 |
|
|||||
John Good | Trustee | 01 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Girish Menon | Trustee | 07 December 2020 |
|
|||||
Dr Chikondi Mpokosa | Trustee | 07 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ramesh Dayalji Parmar | Trustee | 19 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ruchira Neotia | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Maria Herczog | Trustee | 01 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Mike Thiedke | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Camilla Ulfdotter Otto | Trustee | 03 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Anna Julien Segall | Trustee | 03 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Graham Banks | Trustee | 01 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Jane Bruce | Trustee | 01 June 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.