YATTON KEYNELL CHURCH OF ENGLAND RELIGIOUS EDUCATION FUND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Support for young and elderly in the village of Yatton Keynell. Provision of Bibles to By Brook School leavers and reordering of St. Margaret's Church to provide facilities for the children and elderly.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 21 December 2001: Standard registration
- 20 May 2025: Removed (Transferred to exempt chy)
No other names
- Investment
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2 | £0 | £0 | £36 | £53 | |
|
Total expenditure | £504 | £303 | £315 | £0 | £800 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 10 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 10 February 2025 | 102 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 14 May 2024 | 196 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 04 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
STATUTORY INSTRUMENT 1999 NO 3041
Charitable objects
EDUCATIONAL PURPOSES RELATED TO THE PARISH OF YATON KEYNELL IN CONNECTION WITH THE PROVISION OF RELIGIOUS EDUCATION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TENETS OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND BY MEANS OF A SUNDAY SCHOOL OR OTHERWISE.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF YATTON KEYNELL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window