ROBERT LE KYNG SCHOOL SUPPORTERS

Charity Number: 1096505
Charity reporting is overdue by 112 days

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Fund-raising for the school. Arranging social activities.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 05 April 2023

Total income: £3,012
Total expenditure: £1,058

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Human Resources
Where the charity operates:
  • Swindon
  • Wiltshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 13 March 2003: Standard registration
  • 09 October 2015: Removed (Does not operate)
  • 07 November 2015: Re-registered
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • THE RLK SCHOOL SUPPORTERS (Working name)
  • THE ROBERT LE KYNG SCHOOL SUPPORTERS (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Wioleta Karwicka-Fomienko Trustee 10 October 2022
None on record
Tanya Louise Stoneham Trustee 14 May 2014
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023
Total gross income £3.30k £2.41k £253 £58 £3.01k
Total expenditure £2.35k £2.47k £4.50k £508 £1.06k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 112 days
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 112 days
Annual return 05 April 2023 30 May 2024 115 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2022 23 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2021 02 February 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 28 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Robert le Kyng Primary School
Westcott Street
Swindon
SN1 5HS
Phone:
01793523119
Email:
No information available
Website:

robertlekyng.co.uk