Accounts and annual returns HALIFAX YOUNG SINGERS LIMITED

Charity number: 1090730
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2023 09 April 2024 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2022 25 April 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2021 30 March 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 27 October 2021 180 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2019 13 May 2020 13 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 Not Required