Trustees CANCER RESEARCH UK
Charity number: 1089464

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lord Simon Stevens | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rakshit Kapoor | Trustee | 01 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hitesh Thakrar | Trustee | 01 March 2023 |
|
|||||
Professor Doreen Ann Cantrell FRS | Trustee | 04 October 2022 |
|
|||||
PROFESSOR GERARD IAN EVAN | Trustee | 04 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR PAMELA RENATE KEARNS PhD FRCPCH | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Robert James Campbell Easton | Trustee | 02 December 2020 |
|
|||||
JOANNE MARY SHAW | Trustee | 29 September 2020 |
|
|||||
PROFESSOR MOIRA KATHERINE BRIGID WHYTE OBE | Trustee | 02 January 2020 |
|
|||||
PROFESSOR NICHOLAS CLWYD JONES | Trustee | 02 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
TRACY ANNE DE GROOSE LLB | Trustee | 28 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR SIR MICHAEL ADRIAN RICHARDS CBE | Trustee | 01 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Peter Alan Chambre | Trustee | 13 July 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.