Trustees OPERATION SMILE UNITED KINGDOM
Charity number: 1091316
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Maria Ellen Moore | Chair | 22 December 2015 |
|
|
||||
Judy Kathambi Nyaga | Trustee | 02 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Saqib Alam | Trustee | 02 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Diana Elizabeth Dalton | Trustee | 02 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andrew John Bruce | Trustee | 08 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Christopher John Pinnington | Trustee | 09 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr William Preston Magee | Trustee | 03 July 2014 |
|
|
||||
MR PHIL MCDONALD | Trustee | 05 November 2001 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.