Accounts and annual returns THE ARK (EAST HULL)

Charity number: 1092041
Charity reporting is overdue by 286 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2022 Overdue Overdue by 286 days
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2022 Overdue Overdue by 286 days
Annual return 31 October 2021 31 August 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2020 30 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2019 31 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2018 27 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2018 Not Required