ST PAUL'S PRIMARY SCHOOL (HOOK) PARENT STAFF ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1089714
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 August 2020 14 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 August 2019 01 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 August 2018 01 October 2019 93 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 August 2017 20 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 August 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 August 2016 25 October 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 August 2016 Not Required