Accounts and annual returns THE HOWARD OF EFFINGHAM SCHOOL PTA

Charity number: 1090192
Charity reporting is overdue by 514 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 Overdue Overdue by 149 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Overdue Overdue by 149 days
Annual return 31 August 2020 Overdue Overdue by 514 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Overdue Overdue by 514 days
Annual return 31 August 2019 28 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 29 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 14 January 2020 198 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2017 29 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 29 June 2018 On time Download Open in new window