Financial history THE HOWARD OF EFFINGHAM SCHOOL PTA

Charity number: 1090192
Charity reporting is overdue by 454 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2015 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019
Total gross income £12.38k £22.01k £31.51k £33.12k £24.16k
Total expenditure £16.60k £26.86k £17.60k £30.19k £28.73k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A