THE GREAT ST HELEN'S TRUST

Charity number: 1089919
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £571.52k £856.05k £1.81m £1.10m £936.44k
Total expenditure £594.85k £579.31k £595.91k £568.57k £529.32k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £129.55k £413.98k £455.50k £658.10k £410.63k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £394.15k £428.55k £438.40k £432.29k £522.32k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £22.01k £13.52k £5.85k £6.35k £2.83k
Income - Other £25.81k £0 £905.65k £168 £661
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £153.30k £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £584.51k £575.69k £594.89k £567.06k £526.31k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £3.62k £1.02k £1.52k £3.01k
Expenditure - Governance £6.47k £7.60k £5.14k £0 £33.96k
Expenditure - Grants institution £200.00k £130.00k £85.00k £0 £65.00k
Expenditure - Investment management £3.86k £3.62k £1.02k £1.52k £3.01k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0