EASTERN REGION MINISTRY COURSE

Charity number: 1090989
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 05 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 05 April 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2019 10 July 2020 10 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 10 July 2020 10 days late Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 28 March 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 28 March 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2017 23 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 23 March 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2016 13 April 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 13 April 2017 On time Download