Trustees PLYMOUTH MARINE LABORATORY
Charity number: 1091222

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JANICE ELIZABETH TIMBERLAKE | Chair | 08 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Crockett | Trustee | 01 February 2023 |
|
|||||
Dr Jyotika Itee Virmani | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Veronique Garcon | Trustee | 26 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Professor Lucy Carpenter MBE FRS | Trustee | 06 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Paul Robert James | Trustee | 28 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mark James Butcher | Trustee | 13 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Beverley Anne Mackenzie | Trustee | 25 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Nick Buckland | Trustee | 25 October 2017 |
|
|||||
Nigel John Godefroy | Trustee | 07 August 2015 |
|
|
||||
Professor Timothy David Jickells | Trustee | 10 January 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.