CAT MATTERS
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Animals
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Throughout London
Governance
- 19 April 2002: Standard registration
- 16 September 2009: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2004 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2004 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 30TH NOVEMBER 2001 AND AS AMENDED ON 3RD APRIL 2002
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING AND DISTRESS OF CATS AND KITTENS WHO ARE IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT BY WAY OF LIMITATION, BY MAINTAINING A SHELTER OR SHELTERS FOR TREATING UNWANTED, SICK OR ILL-TREATED CATS AND KITTENS, RE-HOMING STRAY OR UNWANTED CATS AND BY PROVIDING VETERINARY TREATMENT AND A NEUTERING SERVICE FOR SUCH CATS; AND TO RELIEVE THE POVERTY OF CAT OWNERS WHO ARE IN NEED IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT BY WAY OF LIMITATION, BY ASSISTING IN THE PAYMENT OF VETERINARY BILLS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window