CAMPAIGN TO PROTECT RURAL ENGLAND

Charity number: 1089685
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Reema Stephenson Trustee 23 June 2021
LIVERPOOL BIENNIAL OF CONTEMPORARY ART LIMITED Received: On time
ANDREW THOMAS JOSEPH TOPLEY Trustee 29 June 2017 None on record
MARTIN CHARLES TYLER Trustee 26 June 2019
PRACTICAL ACTION Received: On time
Professor Patricia Broadfoot CBE FAcSS Trustee 26 June 2019
GLOUCESTER DIOCESAN TRUST Received: On time
THE GLOUCESTER DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE
William Samuel Morgan Rivers Trustee 28 June 2018 None on record
James Richard Lindsay Trustee 24 June 2020 None on record
Safia Laila Minney MBE Trustee 23 June 2021
CONWAY HALL ETHICAL SOCIETY Received: On time
Dr Richard Simmons Trustee 01 January 2018 None on record
DAVID ROBIN BIBBY THOMPSON CBE Trustee 30 June 2016
THE VAUGHAN NASH TRUST Received: On time
Simon Charles Stuart Murray Chair 24 June 2020
MRS CATHERINA BOVEY FUND FOR APPRENTICING Received: On time