Dogfen lywodraethu KIRKLEES ACTIVE LEISURE
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 29/11/2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 13/03/2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 24/09/2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 04/07/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 04/12/2013 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 16/12/2013
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES AND SERVICES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION, PRIMARILY IN KIRKLEES BUT ALSO IN THE WIDER AREA, IN THE INTERESTS OF POSITIVE SOCIAL WELFARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, AND TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT THE GOOD PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH AND WELLBEING OF THOSE PERSONS USING SUCH FAILITIES AND SERVICES
Maes buddion
KIRKLEES. WEST YORKSHIRE
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.