Accounts and annual returns Mountain Training United Kingdom & Ireland Ltd

Charity number: 1090203
Charity reporting is overdue by 89 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 Overdue Overdue by 89 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Overdue Overdue by 89 days
Annual return 31 December 2020 15 March 2022 135 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 15 March 2022 135 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 16 November 2020 16 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 16 November 2020 16 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 20 December 2019 50 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 20 September 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 02 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 25 September 2018 On time Download Open in new window