EAST SUSSEX FOSTER CARE ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1092668
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 23 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 23 December 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 12 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 12 November 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 11 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 11 December 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 31 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 31 October 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 05 August 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 05 August 2016 On time Download