EAST SUSSEX FOSTER CARE ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1092668
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Christine Ellen Phillips Trustee 14 October 2019 None on record
Sandra Josephine Maylam Trustee 01 November 2017 None on record
Ru Petraitis-Williams Trustee 05 April 2016 None on record
Ruma Smith Trustee 14 October 2019 None on record
SUSANNE BEESLEY Chair None on record
Ann Elizabeth Margaret Buchan Trustee 14 October 2019 None on record
ANN HOLDER Trustee 12 March 2001 None on record
Anja Christina Leeves Trustee 01 November 2017 None on record
Mark James Thornborough Trustee 12 October 2015 None on record
Lysette Grosvenor Trustee 10 October 2016 None on record
Tina May Henderson Trustee 12 October 2015 None on record