FRIENDS OF THE PARISH CHURCH OF ST MARY THE VIRGIN, CHESSINGTON

Charity number: 1093851
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 22 April 2020 Overdue Overdue by 83 days
Accounts and TAR 22 April 2020 Overdue Overdue by 83 days
Annual return 22 April 2019 10 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 22 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 22 April 2018 29 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 22 April 2018 Not Required
Annual return 22 April 2017 29 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 22 April 2017 Not Required
Annual return 22 April 2016 01 March 2017 7 days late
Accounts and TAR 22 April 2016 Not Required