FRIENDS OF THE PARISH CHURCH OF ST MARY THE VIRGIN, CHESSINGTON

Charity number: 1093851
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 22/04/2015 22/04/2016 22/04/2017 22/04/2018 22/04/2019
Total gross income £798 £928 £597 £807 £657
Total expenditure £2.40k £863 £0 £329 £491
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A