Accounts and annual returns REFUGEE SUPPORT GROUP DEVON

Charity number: 1092410
Charity reporting is overdue by 111 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 111 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 111 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 28 November 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 02 February 2022 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 01 February 2021 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 22 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required