HEADFIRST PRODUCTIONS LIMITED
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
The promotion of education, appreciation & enjoyment of opera & drama through the presentation of full productions & concerts/selected scenes Training of students & performers in all aspects of theatre production The advancement of understanding of the charity's theatrical productions To support or promote such charitable purposes as the trustees may in their absolute discretion determine
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 31 December 2019
Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Dibenion Elusennol Cyffredinol
- Addysg/hyfforddiant
- Celfyddydau / Diwylliant / Treftadaeth / Gwyddoniaeth
- Y Cyhoedd/dynolryw
- Arall Neu Ddim Un O’r Rhain
- Cymru A Lloegr
Llywodraethu
- 03 Gorffennaf 2002: Cofrestrwyd
- 29 Hydref 2021: Tynnwyd (WEDI PEIDIO Â BODOLI)
- OPERA BY DEFINITION (Enw blaenorol)
- Buddiannau croes
- Rheoli risg
- Diogelu buddiolwyr agored i niwed
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £13.32k | £0 | £31.51k | £2.70k | £450 | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £16.38k | £1.86k | £28.42k | £7.02k | £500 | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2020 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2020 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2019 | 24 Tachwedd 2020 | 24 diwrnod yn hwyr | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2019 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2018 | 23 Hydref 2019 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2018 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2017 | 28 Hydref 2018 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2017 | 28 Hydref 2018 | Ar amser |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 13/12/2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 01/03/2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 13/06/2003 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 08/08/2013
Gwrthrychau elusennol
1. THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN, AND THE PROMOTION OF THE APPRECIATION AND ENJOYMENT OF, OPERA AND MUSIC PRINCIPALLY IN THE SOUTH EAST OF ENGLAND BUT ALSO NATIONALLY AND INTERNATIONALLY AND IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT SO AS TO LIMIT THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING:- (A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION BY THE PRODUCTION AND PRESENTATION OF PRODUCTIONS OF OPERA MUSICAL THEATRE AND CONCERTS (B) THE PROMOTION OF THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF STUDENTS AND PERFORMERS OF MUSIC AND SINGING, THEATRE DESIGN, THEATRE DIRECTION AND ALL OTHER ASPECTS OF OPERA PRODUCTION. (C) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION IN AND UNDERSTANDING OF THE WORKS OF THE CHARITY'S OPERA AND MUSICAL PRODUCTIONS 2. TO SUPPORT OR PROMOTE SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DETERMINE.
Maes buddion
PRINCIPALLY IN THE SOUTH EAST OF ENGLAND BUT ALSO NATIONALLY AND INTERNATIONALLY.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window