Financial history HORBURY CHURCHES TOGETHER

Charity number: 1092641
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £102.68k £101.98k £96.93k £76.60k £93.38k
Total expenditure £86.66k £87.39k £93.63k £90.46k £102.70k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £2.62k £2.50k £60.87k £33.51k £57.42k