Trustees HORBURY CHURCHES TOGETHER

Charity number: 1092641
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
DARREN BYFORD Chair 01 June 2022
SENIOR CITIZENS SUPPORT GROUP
Received: On time
DANIEL OWEN HEATON Trustee 06 March 2024
None on record
Rev ANDREW ATKINS Trustee 27 September 2023
None on record
Rev JACOB KAIGA Trustee 27 September 2023
AIRE AND CALDER METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: On time
Hannah Elizabeth Hobday Trustee 23 November 2022
None on record
Lesley Jane Harrison Trustee 23 November 2022
None on record
Heather Turner Trustee 05 March 2018
WAKEFIELD AND DISTRICT CHILDMINDING ASSOCIATION
Overdue by 1630 days
THE METHODIST CHURCH YORKSHIRE WEST DISTRICT
Overdue by 18 days
THE METHODIST CHURCH IN GREAT BRITAIN
Received: On time
The Reverend Christopher Johnson Trustee 03 April 2017
ST LEONARDS HOSPITAL (OTHERWISE WORMALD'S ALMSHOUSES)
Received: On time
INCORPORATED TRUSTEES OF THE NUMBER 1 TRUST FUND
Received: On time
JOHN HARRY WALTER Trustee
None on record