WOODLANDS PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENT TEACHERS ASSOCIATION (PTA)

Charity number: 1090106
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2019 09 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 09 June 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 22 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 22 May 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2017 12 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 12 June 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2016 03 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2015 19 April 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2015 Not Required