WOODLANDS PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENT TEACHERS ASSOCIATION (PTA)

Charity number: 1090106
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2015 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019
Total gross income £9.51k £10.28k £56.41k £29.06k £35.86k
Total expenditure £9.33k £12.06k £36.15k £35.94k £25.34k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A