Financial history GRASMERE VILLAGE HALL COMPANY LIMITED

Charity number: 1090563
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/11/2016 30/11/2017 30/11/2018 30/11/2019 30/11/2020
Total gross income £10.38k £53.79k £18.93k £37.08k £37.08k
Total expenditure £18.50k £46.41k £17.65k £14.83k £14.83k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £24.67k N/A N/A £10.00k