VOLUNTEER CENTRE MILTON KEYNES

Charity number: 1090792
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Porviding support for local voluntary organisations in recruiting, retaining and managing volunteers and assisting individuals and groups in Milton Keynes in finding the most appropriate volunteering roles.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2013

Total income: £123,563
Total expenditure: £130,043

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • Economic/community Development/employment
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Milton Keynes

Governance

Registration history:
  • 26 February 2002: Standard registration
  • 13 August 2013: Removed (Ceased to exist)
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • THE VOLUNTEER CENTRE - MILTON KEYNES (Working name)
  • MILTON KEYNES VOLUNTEER CONNECTIONS (Previous name)
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2009 31/03/2010 31/03/2011 31/03/2012 31/03/2013
Total gross income £153.78k £138.03k £164.94k £161.31k £123.56k
Total expenditure £146.37k £134.76k £158.74k £165.57k £130.04k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2013 07 August 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2013 07 August 2013 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2012 02 January 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2012 02 January 2013 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2011 13 December 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2011 13 December 2011 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2010 14 January 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 13 January 2011 On Time