Trustees ACTION ON DISABILITY

Charity number: 1091518
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sharon Holder Chair 24 February 2020
None on record
Mustafa Karim Trustee 16 November 2021
None on record
Juliana Lee Dubuisson Trustee 15 November 2021
None on record
Michael Gannon Trustee 12 April 2018
None on record
KATE BETTERIDGE Trustee 17 August 2017
None on record
AMY SUSANNAH RAIT Trustee 17 August 2017
None on record
ANGELECA JANE LOUISE SILVERSIDES Trustee 21 September 2014
None on record
GABRIELLA MARIA ZAHZOUH Trustee 21 August 2014
None on record
PETER HARDEN Trustee 21 August 2014
None on record
VICTORIA SUSAN BRIGNELL Trustee 22 August 2013
MAGPIE DANCE
Received: On time