CARDINAL HUME CENTRE

Charity number: 1090836
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £2.86m £2.89m £3.14m £2.89m £3.46m
Total expenditure £2.66m £2.90m £3.10m £3.12m £3.17m
Income from government contracts £77.00k £360.00k £396.00k N/A £399.00k
Income from government grants £360.00k £0 N/A £424.00k £18.00k
Income - Donations and legacies £2.01m £2.07m £2.31m £2.01m £2.41m
Income - Other trading activities £47.00k £46.00k £51.00k £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £772.00k £710.00k £731.00k £772.00k £818.00k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £2.00k £2.00k £2.00k £1.00k £3.00k
Income - Other £31.00k £58.00k £52.00k £107.00k £231.00k
Income - Legacies £165.00k £118.00k £101.00k £135.00k £191.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.22m £2.39m £2.59m £2.61m £2.68m
Expenditure - Raising funds £442.00k £516.00k £510.00k £507.00k £491.00k
Expenditure - Governance £33.00k £30.00k £54.00k £54.00k £51.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0