CARDINAL HUME CENTRE

Charity number: 1090836
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Mark Doran Trustee 05 December 2019 None on record
Dr Timothy Walsh Trustee 05 December 2019 None on record
Amelia Fitzalan-Howard Trustee 31 December 2013 None on record
HEATHER PETCH OBE Trustee 10 December 2015 None on record
Andrew Rose Trustee 10 December 2015 None on record
William van Klaveren Trustee 15 March 2018 None on record
Rt Rev Nicholas Gilbert Erskine Hudson Trustee 10 February 2015
ARCHBISHOP ROMERO TRUST Received: On time
CULHAM CHAPEL TRUST Received: On time
Patrick John Milner Trustee 31 December 2013 None on record
Rebekah Etherington Trustee 05 December 2019 None on record
Dr Robert Henry Arnott Chair 31 December 2013 None on record
Philomena Egan Trustee 15 March 2018 None on record