Accounts and annual returns THE PEOPLE'S EVANGELISTIC MISSION (NORTH SHIELDS) ENDOWED CHARITY

Charity number: 1091259
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 27 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 23 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 23 December 2020 176 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 23 December 2020 176 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2018 23 December 2020 542 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 23 December 2020 542 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2017 29 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 29 December 2017 On time Download Open in new window