Financial history EASINGTON LANE COMMUNITY ACCESS POINT

Charity number: 1093390
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £192.06k £201.27k £256.81k £365.84k £200.35k
Total expenditure £148.74k £124.29k £220.42k £210.28k £277.56k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £4.00k £15.00k £16.00k £35.00k £35.00k