Trustees EASINGTON LANE COMMUNITY ACCESS POINT
Charity number: 1093390

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RITA GREY | Chair | 09 January 2010 |
|
|
||||
Claire Marilyn Rowntree | Trustee | 13 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Susan Waterston | Trustee | 03 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
John Paul Waters | Trustee | 03 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kay Louise White | Trustee | 03 March 2022 |
|
|||||
Ashleigh Jane Ivison | Trustee | 28 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
David William Geddis | Trustee | 28 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Robert Ian Moody | Trustee | 05 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Linda Cleary | Trustee | 12 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Carol Smith | Trustee | 27 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
George Corner | Trustee | 14 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
MR DON TODD | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.