LONDON TWI WEST CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES

Charity number: 1090506
Charity reporting is overdue by 229 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 229 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 229 days
Annual return 31 March 2019 06 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 17 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 04 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 28 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required