LONDON TWI WEST CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES

Charity number: 1090506
Charity reporting is overdue by 186 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019
Total gross income £7.61k £7.01k £6.35k £7.61k £9.99k
Total expenditure £5.81k £5.84k £6.78k £8.21k £7.50k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A