LONDON TWI WEST CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES

Charity number: 1090506
Charity reporting is overdue by 229 days

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Benjamin Asante Trustee 23 June 2015 None on record
ISAAC ASHONG Trustee None on record
Benjamin Anane Trustee 22 July 2018 None on record
Samuel Nyamekye Trustee 10 October 2017 None on record
DAVID ERNEST ADU MANUH Trustee None on record
Isaac Sabi Mensah Trustee 17 January 2016 None on record
Kwadwo Takyi Trustee 23 June 2015 None on record
COLLINS OWUSU- ANTI Trustee 14 February 2012 None on record
KWAKU BOAKYE Trustee 03 July 2016 None on record
Kwasi Sarpong Trustee 15 January 2017 None on record
London Twi West of Jehovahs Witnessess Trustee 08 February 2002 None on record