TRUST LINKS LIMITED

Charity number: 1092324
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
CLIVE TURRELL Trustee None on record
Keith Terence Spencer Trustee 17 July 2019 None on record
Paul Taylor Trustee 14 October 2020 None on record
Henry Burgess Trustee 14 October 2020 None on record
Lysanne Eddy Trustee 14 October 2020 None on record
Waqar Choudhry Trustee 17 October 2018 None on record
Paul Malcolm Bridges Trustee 18 October 2017 None on record
Richard Olver Chair 19 October 2016 None on record
Janet Phillips Trustee 19 October 2016 None on record
RON BATES Trustee None on record
Chris Flood Trustee 16 October 2019 None on record