ADVENTURE OUTREACH

Charity number: 1093967
Charity reporting is overdue by 91 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2020 Overdue Overdue by 91 days
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 Overdue Overdue by 91 days
Annual return 31 October 2019 20 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2018 02 January 2020 124 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2017 09 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2016 27 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2016 Not Required