ADVENTURE OUTREACH

Charity number: 1093967
Charity reporting is overdue by 88 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/10/2015 31/10/2016 31/10/2017 31/10/2018 31/10/2019
Total gross income £6.23k £6.23k £5.66k £5.30k £715
Total expenditure £8.46k £8.46k £9.68k £7.83k £6.02k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A